Texas Real Estate Agent and Firm Lookup
Find Real Estate Sales Agents and Brokers in Texas.Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage,
TREC
2401 Cedar Springs Road Suite
Dallas, TX 75201
Dallas, TX 75201
Office Name:
Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage,
Office Type:
Corp Broker
License:
591725
Office Status:
Active
Office Phone:
(214) 438-6100
Office Email:
renda.hampton@am.jll.com
Broker Name:
Daniel Glyn Bellow
License Issued:
12-11-2008
License Expires:
12-31-2025
Powered By Realty Texas
Agents Sponsored by Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage,
License | Name | Company | License Issued | License Expires | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
496906 | Aaron Ace Schlameus | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-03-2002 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
795228 | Abby Oltmann | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-26-2022 | 10-31-2024 | Active |
785476 | Abigail Grace Frazier | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-21-2022 | 05-31-2026 | Active |
826024 | Adon Stassi | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-10-2024 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
428717 | Alan Baxter Wood | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-28-1993 | 05-31-2025 | Active |
736950 | Albert William Clay IV | 05-16-2020 | 05-31-2026 | Active | |
524315 | Alcide Miguel Longoria | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-23-2004 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
708829 | Alex M Hrapkiewicz | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-31-2018 | 07-31-2026 | Inactive |
714804 | Alexander Bostick Whitman | 12-11-2018 | 12-31-2022 | Expired | |
644062 | Alexander Hollins Kelly | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-24-2014 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
766369 | Alexandra Giselle Montanez Alv | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-31-2021 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
569876 | Amy Nott Ramirez | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-28-2007 | 03-31-2026 | Active |
629620 | Andrew Cornwell | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-04-2013 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
646607 | Andrew Mark Scudder | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-30-2014 | 02-29-2024 | Active |
519127 | Andrew Phillip Leatherman | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-12-2004 | 03-31-2025 | Active |
676538 | Andrew Ryan Samples | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-09-2016 | 07-31-2026 | Inactive |
519423 | Andrew Scott Fikes | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-19-2004 | 04-30-2026 | Active |
437626 | Andrew William Taguwa | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-13-1994 | 01-31-2025 | Active |
774145 | Angela Carrier | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-25-2021 | 11-30-2025 | Active |
763686 | Angela Christine Watford | 06-22-2021 | 06-30-2025 | Active | |
721620 | Angus Fraser Wallace Graham | 05-08-2019 | 05-31-2025 | Active | |
645792 | Ashley Nicole Tanton | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-08-2014 | 09-30-2026 | Active |
639992 | Ashley Winchester | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-08-2014 | 04-30-2026 | Active |
574957 | Austin Sanders Mcwilliams | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-10-2007 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
775232 | Ayanna Michelle Jarvis | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-16-2021 | 12-31-2025 | Active |
493160 | Barbara Wynn Houlihan | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-06-2002 | 02-28-2026 | Active |
562633 | Barry Neal Haydon | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-13-2006 | 10-31-2024 | Active |
654643 | Benjamin Nelson Jordan | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-23-2015 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
707293 | Benjamin Sample | 07-03-2018 | 07-31-2026 | Active | |
609899 | Bethany Perez | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-01-2010 | 12-31-2025 | Active |
681068 | Blake Aaron Rogers | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-16-2016 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
459408 | Blanca C Ruiz | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-22-1997 | 02-28-2026 | Active |
709792 | Brandon Brower | 08-17-2018 | 08-31-2026 | Active | |
558646 | Brandon Shay Clarke | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-18-2006 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
645848 | Breanne Alexandra Miller Brown | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-11-2014 | 09-30-2024 | Active |
521518 | Bret David Hefton | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-15-2004 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
630425 | Brian Lawrence Kates | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-28-2013 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
597072 | Brian Michael Adams | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-17-2009 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
779762 | Brit Weston King | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-01-2022 | 03-31-2026 | Active |
630719 | Brittany Nicole Ofield | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-09-2013 | 03-31-2025 | Active |
638548 | Bruce H Wood | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-28-2014 | 02-28-2026 | Inactive |
632622 | Bryant Lach | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-27-2013 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
680669 | Carl Mcneely Mueller | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-05-2016 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
700931 | Caroline Quinn Leary | 02-13-2018 | 02-28-2026 | Active | |
670987 | Charles Winston Sheehan | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-13-2016 | 04-30-2026 | Active |
651290 | Christian Canion | 02-03-2015 | 02-28-2025 | Active | |
591761 | Christine Cornelius Fuller | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-12-2008 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
575098 | Christopher Blair Wadley | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-11-2007 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
577382 | Christopher Blake Shipley | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-27-2007 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
645967 | Christopher Cannon Camp | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-16-2014 | 06-30-2025 | Inactive |
730363 | Christopher Higbie | 11-08-2019 | 11-30-2025 | Active | |
510337 | Christopher Pierce Owens | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-01-2003 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
734391 | Clara Marie Vanlandingham | 02-12-2020 | 02-28-2026 | Active | |
622732 | Clint Ikard Coe | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-13-2012 | 09-30-2025 | Active |
689794 | Cody Doolin | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-09-2017 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
681368 | Cody R Little | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-22-2016 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
560649 | Collin Reed Grimes | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-30-2006 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
644630 | Colton Dale Mccasland | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-08-2014 | 05-31-2025 | Active |
596050 | Conor Paul Mccarthy | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-05-2009 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
787283 | Courtney Coleman | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-17-2022 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
454925 | Craig Allen Jones | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-21-1997 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
392075 | Curtis John Holcomb | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-08-1988 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
709135 | Dalton Randal Knipe | 08-07-2018 | 08-31-2026 | Active | |
498852 | Daniel Glyn Bellow JR | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-25-2002 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
591625 | David Alan Buescher | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-08-2008 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
562361 | David Austin Barrett | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-06-2006 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
683605 | David Berzina | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-24-2017 | 01-31-2025 | Active |
388877 | David Matthew Bale | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-12-1987 | 11-30-2025 | Active |
701515 | David Michael Holland | 02-27-2018 | 11-30-2024 | Active | |
750405 | David Ramidzan | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-15-2020 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
433385 | Deborah L Johnson | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-02-1994 | 04-30-2026 | Active |
617362 | Denise Raina Dasse Letcher | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-15-2011 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
373795 | Douglas Kurt Griffin | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-13-1987 | 05-31-2025 | Active |
711856 | Dustin Henry Potter | 09-29-2018 | 09-30-2020 | Expired | |
748734 | Eliza Klein | 11-18-2020 | 11-30-2024 | Active | |
696649 | Elizabeth Ann Prochazka | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-27-2017 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
507056 | Elizabeth Bowman Clampitt | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-29-2003 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
729941 | Elizabeth Kathryn Peters | 11-01-2019 | 11-30-2021 | Expired | |
632955 | Elizabeth Knight Jones | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-04-2013 | 09-30-2025 | Active |
725637 | Elizabeth Whitaker Ansbro | 08-02-2019 | 08-31-2025 | Active | |
531658 | Emily Durham | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-14-2005 | 03-31-2026 | Active |
622286 | Eugene Thomas Coradini | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-24-2012 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
458735 | Fiona Natasha Forkner | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-14-1997 | 06-30-2024 | Expired |
806423 | Flor Rodriguez Flores | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-06-2023 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
628232 | Francisco Javier Flores | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-18-2013 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
576250 | Geoffrey Clement Shelton | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-03-2007 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
650159 | Geoffrey Michael Perrott | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-06-2015 | 01-31-2025 | Active |
827010 | Grace Gammill | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-03-2024 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
808467 | Graham Cash | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-11-2023 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
672378 | Graham Schmergel | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-12-2016 | 05-31-2026 | Active |
700427 | Haley Bataillon | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-01-2018 | 02-29-2024 | Expired |
569643 | Harlan Cribbs Altman IV | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-22-2007 | 03-31-2025 | Active |
800157 | Harrison Biro | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-09-2023 | 02-28-2025 | Active |
632990 | Harrison Taylor Burt | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-06-2013 | 09-30-2025 | Active |
745135 | Harrison Yang | 09-29-2020 | 09-30-2026 | Active | |
744788 | Hayden Brooks Harder | 09-23-2020 | 09-30-2024 | Active | |
501376 | Heather Renee Martin | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-14-2002 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
811034 | Howard Wesley House JR | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-24-2023 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
788605 | Hudson Henry Neuhoff | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-08-2022 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
764529 | Isaiah Lawrence Wilson | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-03-2021 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
615361 | Jack Anthony Russo | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-30-2011 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
809645 | Jack Solomon Fulp | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-31-2023 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
717160 | Jacob Turner George Whaley | 02-08-2019 | 02-28-2023 | Expired | |
656476 | James Christian Burns | 06-07-2015 | 06-30-2025 | Active | |
389944 | James Madison Eagle | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-30-1987 | 02-28-2026 | Active |
539110 | James Michael Haggar | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-14-2005 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
484478 | Jarret M Venghaus | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-12-2001 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
672850 | Jason Dodson | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-21-2016 | 05-31-2026 | Active |
826354 | Jayme Schutt | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-18-2024 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
497530 | Jeffery Thomas Eckert | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-18-2002 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
586631 | Jeffrey Ryan Wood | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-02-2008 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
470420 | Jeffrey Scott Venghaus | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-12-1999 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
436253 | Jeffrey Warren Miller | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-15-1994 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
809711 | Jenna Hassam | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-01-2023 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
468794 | Jeremy Chad Baker | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-03-1999 | 05-31-2025 | Active |
789588 | Jerome L Burch | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-23-2022 | 07-31-2024 | Expired |
517262 | Jerrod Austin Mcquain | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-24-2004 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
770546 | Jessica Hughes | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-01-2021 | 10-31-2023 | Expired |
817159 | Jillian R Wilson | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-28-2023 | 12-31-2025 | Active |
419936 | John Andrew Burke | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-21-1992 | 03-31-2025 | Active |
411193 | John Anthony Gates | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-15-1990 | 11-30-2025 | Active |
428645 | John Frank Taylor III | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-22-1993 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
730940 | John Glenn Davidson | 11-21-2019 | 11-30-2025 | Active | |
744939 | John Griffith Walsh | 09-25-2020 | 09-30-2024 | Active | |
748381 | John Priddy | 11-13-2020 | 11-30-2024 | Active | |
779385 | John Tallis | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-24-2022 | 02-28-2026 | Active |
452366 | John Turner Worthen | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-19-1996 | 03-31-2026 | Active |
457298 | John William Childers | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-25-1997 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
386391 | Jon Curtis Mcneil | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-16-1987 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
612542 | Jon M Switzer | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-19-2011 | 04-30-2026 | Active |
589544 | Jon Travis Sawvell | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-12-2008 | 09-30-2024 | Active |
611154 | Jonathan Carrier | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-03-2018 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
679841 | Jordan Raney | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-18-2016 | 10-31-2024 | Active |
663494 | Joseph Arnold Berwick | 11-06-2015 | 11-30-2025 | Active | |
714202 | Joseph Bo Puckett | 11-22-2018 | 11-30-2024 | Active | |
724787 | Joshua Garrett Green | 07-16-2019 | 07-31-2025 | Active | |
698293 | Joshua Mark O'rear | 12-05-2017 | 12-31-2025 | Active | |
724853 | Julie Ann Colwell | 07-16-2019 | 07-31-2025 | Active | |
763645 | Kade A Davis | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-22-2021 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
750753 | Karie Melissa Chitwood | 12-17-2020 | 12-31-2024 | Active | |
796433 | Karina Weathers | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-19-2022 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
534211 | Kathleen Carbonetti | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-05-2005 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
766457 | Kathleen Renee Madden | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-02-2021 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
417941 | Kelley Arthur Kackley | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-03-1991 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
825045 | Kelley Sigl | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-18-2024 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
808884 | Kendall Kerr | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-18-2023 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
776615 | Kendall Lara Hughes | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-12-2022 | 01-31-2026 | Active |
763837 | Kennedy Nicole Gamble | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-24-2021 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
634254 | Kenneth Blake Waltrip | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-14-2013 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
658074 | Kenneth Coleman Sacco | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-11-2015 | 07-31-2019 | Expired |
752753 | Kevaneau Joseph Green | 01-19-2021 | 01-31-2025 | Active | |
424160 | Kevin Alan Erck | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-13-1992 | 10-31-2024 | Active |
702601 | Kevin Andrew Griffiths | 03-24-2018 | 03-31-2026 | Active | |
483093 | Kevin Henry Kimbrough | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-14-2001 | 02-28-2025 | Active |
571900 | Kimarie Lauren Ankenbrand | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-07-2007 | 05-31-2021 | Expired |
538306 | Kirby Ross Cone | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-27-2005 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
753107 | Kodie Raine Comby | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-25-2021 | 01-31-2025 | Active |
793663 | Kristina Richter | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-30-2022 | 09-30-2024 | Active |
637460 | Kyle Roberts Mcculloch | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-28-2014 | 01-31-2026 | Active |
389334 | Larry Marshall Toon | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-28-1987 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
630804 | Lauren Ellis Halstedt | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-11-2013 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
605681 | Lauren Gayle Perry | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-11-2010 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
777150 | Lauren Stifflemire | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-20-2022 | 01-31-2026 | Active |
457859 | Leah Follett Miller | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-26-1997 | 09-30-2024 | Active |
714945 | Leland Palmer Folkes | 12-13-2018 | 12-31-2024 | Active | |
601499 | Lenora Michelle Cowsen | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-08-2010 | 01-31-2025 | Active |
641620 | Lonna I Jenks | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-02-2014 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
469132 | Louie Anthony Crapitto | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-19-1999 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
808469 | Lucas Leonardo De La Garza | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-11-2023 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
685948 | Madeline Marie Gregory | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-23-2017 | 03-31-2025 | Active |
679281 | Madeline Simons | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-04-2016 | 10-31-2024 | Active |
742622 | Madison Eve Hornisher | 08-21-2020 | 08-31-2026 | Active | |
687358 | Maggie Jane Birnbach | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-18-2017 | 04-30-2025 | Inactive |
706453 | Mallory Lynn Kelly | 06-16-2018 | 06-30-2026 | Active | |
780288 | Mallory Morris | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-09-2022 | 03-31-2026 | Active |
581332 | Mark Allen Raines | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-07-2007 | 12-31-2025 | Active |
405154 | Mark Edward Krenger | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-12-1990 | 05-31-2026 | Active |
395835 | Mark Gerald Nicholas | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-28-1988 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
652893 | Mark Harris | 03-12-2015 | 03-31-2025 | Active | |
326364 | Mark Randall Newman | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-14-1986 | 09-30-2026 | Active |
649632 | Mark Reilly | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-16-2014 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
800700 | Martin Gutierrez Fernandez | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-17-2023 | 02-28-2025 | Active |
764640 | Mary Michael Mccartin | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-05-2021 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
805206 | Mason Robert Duke Graham | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-12-2023 | 05-31-2025 | Active |
630109 | Matthew Lewis Webb | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-19-2013 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
817241 | Matthew Nemry | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-30-2023 | 12-31-2025 | Active |
596479 | Matthew Thomas Montague | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-24-2009 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
707501 | Mckenna O'donnell | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-06-2018 | 07-31-2024 | Expired |
697251 | Megan Rose Andrew | 11-09-2017 | 11-30-2025 | Active | |
473595 | Melissa Anne Holland | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-02-1999 | 12-31-2025 | Active |
791635 | Meredith Ann Bretting | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-26-2022 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
631025 | Meredith Sheeder | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-16-2013 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
736617 | Micah Jones | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-08-2020 | 05-31-2026 | Inactive |
769039 | Michael Andrew Schwartz | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-08-2021 | 09-30-2025 | Active |
701809 | Michael Charles Williams | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-06-2018 | 03-31-2026 | Active |
760978 | Michael Rhett Kruger | 05-15-2021 | 05-31-2025 | Active | |
558496 | Michael Ryan Fuselier | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-14-2006 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
407274 | Michael Todd Wheat | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-18-1990 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
680879 | Michael Travis Smith | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-10-2016 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
496970 | Michele Lyn Johnson | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-03-2002 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
514149 | Michelle Renee Kimmey | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-17-2003 | 11-30-2025 | Active |
518569 | Natalie Denise Case | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-30-2004 | 03-31-2025 | Inactive |
810345 | Natalie O'brien | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-11-2023 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
645968 | Natasha Khan | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-16-2014 | 09-30-2022 | Expired |
525002 | Nathan Jackson Orbin | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-08-2004 | 11-30-2025 | Active |
670666 | Nina M Farrell | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-06-2016 | 04-30-2026 | Active |
772672 | Parker Grona | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-31-2021 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
596610 | Patrick Robert Madsen | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-29-2009 | 06-30-2026 | Active |
785518 | Paul Ernest Davis | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-22-2022 | 05-31-2026 | Active |
303818 | Paul Hardy Frazier | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-19-2021 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
707198 | Paula L Whitman | 06-29-2018 | 06-30-2026 | Active | |
614668 | Rachael Patricia Keener | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-29-2011 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
720844 | Rachel Allen Gorney | 04-20-2019 | 04-30-2025 | Active | |
730745 | Raelin Pagulayan Fontenot | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-16-2019 | 11-30-2023 | Expired |
628381 | Ramon Patricio Saucedo | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-23-2013 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
823554 | Reah Huggins Sutton | 05-14-2024 | 05-31-2026 | Active | |
722622 | Rebecca Ann Dale | 05-31-2019 | 05-31-2021 | Expired | |
659812 | Reid Wesley Gilbreath | 08-20-2015 | 08-31-2025 | Active | |
705783 | Richard Walker Dyess JR | 06-05-2018 | 06-30-2026 | Active | |
623515 | Robert E Franks | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-12-2012 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
797326 | Robert Landry Shive | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-09-2022 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
376935 | Robert Lee Harder JR | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-17-1987 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
738316 | Robert Oliver Mcdonough | 06-11-2020 | 06-30-2026 | Active | |
530167 | Roger Chilton Hill III | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-14-2005 | 01-31-2025 | Active |
686332 | Roman Rodriguez | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-28-2017 | 03-31-2025 | Active |
378500 | Ronald Duane Deyo | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-17-1987 | 11-30-2025 | Active |
687284 | Ryan Roth | 04-14-2017 | 04-30-2025 | Active | |
517463 | Ryan T Matthews | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-01-2004 | 04-30-2026 | Active |
551100 | Samuel Austin Slovacek | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-22-2006 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
178787 | Sanford Webb Criner JR | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-04-1991 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
816100 | Sarah Elisabeth Cole | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-02-2023 | 12-31-2025 | Active |
813256 | Sarah Milliren | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-05-2023 | 10-31-2025 | Active |
630897 | Sarah Savage | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 07-15-2013 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
620378 | Scott Jeffrey Hage | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-31-2012 | 02-28-2025 | Active |
744646 | Sharon Philomina Kariampuzha | 09-22-2020 | 09-30-2022 | Expired | |
736377 | Shauna Elaine Sophy | 05-06-2020 | 05-31-2026 | Active | |
456048 | Sherie Kavel | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-17-1997 | 06-30-2025 | Active |
380606 | Simmi Sapna Jaggi | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-22-1987 | 02-28-2025 | Active |
514993 | Steven W Garven | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-29-2019 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
668705 | Sulema Lulloff | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-26-2016 | 02-28-2026 | Active |
559511 | Susan Holt Smallwood | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-08-2006 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
616775 | Taylor Dickerson | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-09-2011 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
827685 | Taylor Messina | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-18-2024 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
797015 | Terrhan Dial | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-02-2022 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
591103 | Terry Brent Powdrill | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 11-13-2008 | 11-30-2024 | Active |
178155 | Terry Wayne Darrow | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 06-08-1993 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
504921 | Thomas Alvin Saldana | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-26-2003 | 10-31-2026 | Active |
350404 | Thomas Davis Briggs | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-06-1992 | 07-31-2026 | Active |
784102 | Thomas Ryan Greene | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 05-01-2022 | 05-31-2026 | Active |
781680 | Timidi Amaso | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-30-2022 | 03-31-2026 | Active |
535928 | Timothy Joseph Dowdle JR | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-25-2015 | 08-31-2025 | Active |
540838 | Torrey Alison Littlejohn | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 08-17-2005 | 08-31-2026 | Active |
603284 | Travis Erwin Secor | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-16-2010 | 03-31-2025 | Active |
444817 | Trevor House Franke | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 10-10-1995 | 10-31-2024 | Active |
734856 | Valeria Guerrero | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 02-23-2020 | 02-28-2026 | Inactive |
729773 | Victor Darnell Williams JR | 10-29-2019 | 10-31-2025 | Active | |
801781 | Vincent Francis Xavier Otoole | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 03-09-2023 | 03-31-2025 | Active |
482677 | Vincent James Galati | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-22-2001 | 07-31-2025 | Active |
619260 | Virginia Von Russell | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 04-05-2012 | 04-30-2025 | Active |
705958 | Walker Pennington | 06-08-2018 | 06-30-2026 | Active | |
769273 | William Reese Bowles | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 09-11-2021 | 09-30-2025 | Active |
825062 | William T Prevost | 06-18-2024 | 06-30-2026 | Active | |
547886 | William Tyler Garrett | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 12-28-2005 | 12-31-2024 | Active |
746883 | Yuma Morris | 10-24-2020 | 10-31-2024 | Active | |
549182 | Zane Weston Cole | Jones Lang Lasalle Brokerage, | 01-19-2006 | 02-28-2026 | Active |
Powered By Realty Texas
Information deemed reliable but not guaranteed and should be verified. Realty Texas provides content “AS IS,” without any warranty, express or implied.
This data is sourced from public records and government databases. If you are a real estate agent with publicly available information and wish to submit a data update request, please send an email to data@realty.inc. Include a link to the verified data or attach the relevant documents.